WI SB517 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.60 (4) (b), 48.63 (3) (b) 3., 48.837 (1m), 48.837 (1r) (c), 48.913 (2) (a), 48.98 (4) (a), 632.896 (1) (c) 3., 938.988, 938.999 (1) (b) 13. and 938.999 (3) (c); and to create 14.94, 20.437 (1) (d), 48.9895 and 48.99 of the statutes; relating to: the Interstate Compact for the Placement of Children.
Title
The Interstate Compact for the Placement of Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Published 5-26-2010 | |
2010-05-13 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-13-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 339 | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to the Governor on 5-11-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-23-2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:32 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-03-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-02 | Received from Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-02 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on calendar 3-2-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-02-25 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-24 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-24 | Report passage recommended by committee on Children and Families and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families and Workforce Development | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced |