WI SB523 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 111.84 (1) (g) and 111.991 (1) (g) of the statutes; relating to: unfair labor practices in violation of collective bargaining rights.
Title
Unfair labor practices in violation of collective bargaining rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Published 5-26-2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-12-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 289 | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to the Governor on 5-11-2010 | |
2010-04-26 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-26-2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 51, Noes 47 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 12:01 P.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 15 | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Coggs | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-10 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-10 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2010-03-10 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-03 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-12 | Senator Sullivan added as a coauthor | |
2010-02-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced |