WI SB546 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 448.52 (1m) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the practice of physical therapy students and physical therapist assistant students and granting rule-making authority.
Title
The practice of physical therapy students and physical therapist assistant students and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb546 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB546.pdf |