WI SB547 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 302.388 (3); and to create 146.82 (2) (a) 22., 252.15 (5) (a) 21., 302.388 (2) (g) and 302.388 (3) (b) of the statutes; relating to: informing correctional officers about inmates with contagious diseases.
Title
Informing correctional officers about inmates with contagious diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Senator Kapanke added as a coauthor | |
2010-04-06 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-06 | Report passage recommended by committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-31 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb547 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB547.pdf |