WI SB55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 39.40 (1) (b), 39.40 (1) (d) and 39.40 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 39.40 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: the minority teacher loan program. (FE)
Title
The minority teacher loan program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Bewley |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Kooyenga and L. Taylor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb55 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB55.pdf |