WI SB559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 33.22 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: bid requirements for public inland lake protection and rehabilitation districts.
Title
Bid requirements for public inland lake protection and rehabilitation districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Jon Plumer [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 62, Noes 35 |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Swearingen |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2020-02-20 | House | Read |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |