WI SB58 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 281.75 (2) (e), 281.75 (9) (a) and 281.75 (11) (ae); to renumber and amend 281.75 (5) (f) and 281.75 (9) (b); to amend 281.75 (7) (c) 7., 281.75 (11) (a) 8. and 281.75 (11m); and to create 281.75 (2) (g), 281.75 (5) (f) 2., 281.75 (7) (d) and 281.75 (9) (am), (bm), (c) and (d) of the statutes; Relating to: nitrate contamination and the well compensation grant program. (FE)
Title
Nitrate contamination and the well compensation grant program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |