WI SB598 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 45.82 (3); to amend 20.485 (1) (gk) and 45.82 (2); and to create 45.82 (3m) (a) and 45.82 (3m) (b) 1. to 5. of the statutes; Relating to: grants to counties and tribes for veterans services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to counties and tribes for veterans services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb598 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB598.pdf |