WI SB64 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.465 (3) (v), 20.465 (3) (w), 20.465 (3) (x), 25.17 (1) (gg), 25.34 and 323.65 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a hazard mitigation revolving loan program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a hazard mitigation revolving loan program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Deb Andraca [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |