WI SB664 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (1) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: charitable donations to the family of a law enforcement officer or fire fighter killed in the line of duty. (FE)
Title
Charitable donations to the family of a law enforcement officer or fire fighter killed in the line of duty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb664 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB664.pdf |