WI SB674 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 346.17 (5), 346.22 (1) (b), 346.43 (1) (b) 3., 346.49 (1) (c), 346.60 (3m) (a), 346.65 (5m) and 349.11 (10); to amend 346.43 (4) (a), 346.43 (4) (b), 346.49 (5) (a), 346.49 (5) (b), 346.89 (4m) and 349.06 (3); and to create 340.01 (15pu), 346.17 (5) (b), 346.22 (1) (b) 2., 346.43 (1) (b) 3. b., 346.49 (1) (c) 2., 346.60 (3m) (a) 2., 346.65 (5m) (b) and 349.11 (10) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: traffic violations when emergency or roadside response vehicles are present and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic violations when emergency or roadside response vehicles are present and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2020-02-25SenateRepresentative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
2020-02-11SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-24SenateRepresentative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
2020-01-09SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
2020-01-09SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback