WI SB688 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 343.301 (1g) (a) 2. a. and 343.301 (1g) (a) 2. b.; to renumber and amend 343.301 (1g) (a) 2. (intro.); and to amend 165.957 (3) (a), 165.957 (4) (a) 2., 165.957 (4) (b) 2. and 165.957 (4) (b) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: requiring an ignition interlock device to be installed for committing a drunken driving offense. (FE)
Title
Requiring an ignition interlock device to be installed for committing a drunken driving offense. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb688 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB688.pdf |