WI SB692 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Published 2-1-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Published 2-1-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 440.03 (13) (c); to amend 15.405 (6) (a), 15.405 (6) (b), 36.60 (1) (ae), 45.40 (1g) (a), 77.54 (14) (f) 6., 146.81 (1) (c), 146.997 (1) (d) 3., 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 3., 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 440.03 (9) (a) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.15, 446.01 (1v) (b), chapter 447 (title), 447.01 (intro.), 447.01 (8) (bm), 447.01 (13), 447.02 (1) (e), 447.02 (2) (c), 447.02 (2) (d), 447.02 (2) (e), 447.02 (2) (j), 447.02 (4), 447.02 (5), 447.03 (1) (intro.), 447.03 (2) (intro.), 447.03 (3) (intro.), 447.06 (1), 447.06 (2) (b), 447.06 (2) (c) (intro.), 447.06 (2) (e) (intro.), 447.065 (1) (intro.), 447.065 (2), 447.07 (3) (intro.), 447.07 (3) (f), 447.07 (3) (j), 447.09, 447.10, 447.12 (1), 448.956 (4), 450.10 (3) (a) 4., 451.02 (1), 462.02 (2) (d), 462.04, 463.10 (5), 463.12 (5) and 895.48 (1m) (a) (intro.); and to create 14.875, 440.03 (11m) (c) 1t., 440.03 (13) (c) 1. i., subchapter I (title) of chapter 447 [precedes 447.01], 447.01 (1t), 447.01 (1u), 447.04 (1) (bm), 447.04 (2) (bm), subchapter II of chapter 447 [precedes 447.50] and 990.01 (6m) of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Published 2-1-2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 1-31-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 88 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-29-2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-01-25 | Senate | LRB correction |
2024-01-25 | Senate | LRB correction |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2024-01-16 | House | Read |
2024-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |