WI SB711 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 281.665 (5) (c) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: priorities and criteria for the municipal flood control and riparian restoration program and amending administrative rules. (FE)
Title
Priorities and criteria for the municipal flood control and riparian restoration program and amending administrative rules. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb711 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB711.pdf |