WI SB73 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 940.09 (1c) (a) and 940.09 (1c) (b); and to create 940.09 (1c) (a) 2. and 940.09 (1c) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Representative Tusler withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb73 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB73.pdf |