WI SB742 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.197 (1) (b) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: an alternative teacher certification program for an initial license to teach.
Title
An alternative teacher certification program for an initial license to teach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 197 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:28 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |