WI SB837 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.165 (1) (d) and 118.33 (1) (a) 1. b.; and to create 115.28 (55v), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. m., 118.60 (2) (a) 10., 119.23 (2) (a) 10. and 121.02 (1) (L) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: required instruction in civics in the elementary and high school grades, high school graduation requirements, and private school educational program criteria. (FE)
Title
Required instruction in civics in the elementary and high school grades, high school graduation requirements, and private school educational program criteria. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Representative Green added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Representative Moses added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |