WI SB845 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.995 (2) (vb) and (vd), 71.07 (5n) (a) 9. d. and 71.28 (5n) (a) 9. d. of the statutes; Relating to: standard industrial classification codes for linen supply and industrial launderers and modifying the manufacturing and agriculture tax credit. (FE)
Title
Standard industrial classification codes for linen supply and industrial launderers and modifying the manufacturing and agriculture tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson and Smith |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Introduced |