WI SB854 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.11 (1); and to create 118.2915 and 448.03 (2) (qm) of the statutes; Relating to: the supply and use of short-acting bronchodilators on school premises or at a school-sponsored event.
Title
The supply and use of short-acting bronchodilators on school premises or at a school-sponsored event.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Introduced |