WI SB903 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0502; and to amend 17.03 (4) (d), 60.37 (1) and 63.08 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: local government employee residency requirements. (FE)
Title
Local government employee residency requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |