WI SB931 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 961.573 (4) and 961.574 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: pill tableting devices, pill encapsulation devices, and providing a penalty.
Title
Pill tableting devices, pill encapsulation devices, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representatives Dittrich and Duchow withdrawn as cosponsors |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |