WI SB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 60.31 (3) (b) and 755.03 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the official bond requirements for town municipal judges. (FE)
Title
Changing the official bond requirements for town municipal judges. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb94 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB94.pdf |