WI SB949 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.302 (4), 948.051 (4), 950.04 (1v) (eg) and 950.04 (2w) (fg) of the statutes; Relating to: courtroom supports for and sealing the identifying information of child victims and child witnesses of human trafficking crimes. (FE)
Title
Courtroom supports for and sealing the identifying information of child victims and child witnesses of human trafficking crimes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |