WI SB95 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 29.733 (1); to renumber and amend 29.733 (3); to amend 29.705 (2) (a), 29.733 (2) (a), 29.733 (2) (b), 29.733 (2) (e), 30.40 (1), 77.52 (13), 234.91 (1) (a), 234.91 (2) (b), 281.36 (3g) (a) 7., 281.36 (3n) (a) 1. b., 281.36 (4) (e) (intro.), 283.31 (3) (intro.), 283.31 (4) (intro.), 283.31 (5m) and 348.27 (18) (c); and to create 29.707, 29.733 (1d), 29.733 (1h) (c) 4., 29.733 (3) (b), 30.19 (1m) (bm), 31.34 (3) (am), 77.54 (64), 281.346 (2) (bm), 281.36 (4) (am), 283.15 (4m) and 348.27 (18) (a) 1. e. of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of aquaculture and fish farms, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of aquaculture and fish farms, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Representative Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Representative R. Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb95 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB95.pdf |