WI SB985 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 234.66 (4) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: regional allocation of residential housing infrastructure revolving loan.
Title
Regional allocation of residential housing infrastructure revolving loan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |