WI SB99 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Published 3-15-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Published 3-15-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 281.58 (8) (a) 2.; and to create 281.58 (7) (b) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: funding for reduction of infiltration and inflow in connecting laterals and sewer lines. (FE)
Title
Funding for reduction of infiltration and inflow in connecting laterals and sewer lines. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 106 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-05-30 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-08 | House | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |