WI SJR3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: modifying the session schedule for the 2019-20 biennial session period for purposes of extending the deadline for the governor's budget message.
Title
Modifying the session schedule for the 2019-20 biennial session period for purposes of extending the deadline for the governor's budget message.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-21-2019 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-01-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-01-22 | House | Concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Privileged and read |
2019-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Noes 3 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Considered as privileged and taken up |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |