WI SJR43 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day and honoring the Hmong-Lao veterans who served alongside the United States in the Vietnam War.
Title
Commemorating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day and honoring the Hmong-Lao veterans who served alongside the United States in the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |