WI SJR63 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To renumber section 8 of article VIII; and to create section 8 (2) of article VIII of the constitution; Relating to: requiring a supermajority in each house of the legislature for passage of tax increase legislation (first consideration).
Title
Requiring a supermajority in each house of the legislature for passage of tax increase legislation (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |