WV HB2010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to make modifications to West Virginia’s foster care system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to foster care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 543) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 655) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 654) (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 55) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 51) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseChapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-26HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-08SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 543)
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House changed effective date
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 655)
2019-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 654)
2019-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424)
2019-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-07SenateHealth Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07SenateLindsay Amendment to Health committee amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2019-03-07SenateFinance Amendments to Health committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07SenateHealth Committee Amendment Reported
2019-03-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-06SenateReported do pass, with amendments
2019-03-02SenateOn 2nd reading to Finance
2019-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-02SenateImmediate consideration
2019-03-02SenateReported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance
2019-02-01SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-01SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-31HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-31HousePassed House (Roll No. 55)
2019-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-31HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-30HouseAmendment rejected (Voice vote)
2019-01-30HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-30HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No 51)
2019-01-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-30HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-18HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2019-01-18HouseDo pass, but first to Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseTo House Senior, Children, and Family Issues
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-17HouseTo Senior, Children, and Family Issues then Health and Human Resources
2019-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491206Amended CodeCitation Text
49210Amended CodeCitation Text
492107Amended CodeCitation Text
492111aNew CodeSee Bill Text
492111bNew CodeSee Bill Text
492113Amended CodeCitation Text
492708Amended CodeCitation Text
494108Amended CodeCitation Text
494406Amended CodeCitation Text
494413Amended CodeCitation Text
494604Amended CodeCitation Text
494608Amended CodeCitation Text
494711Amended CodeCitation Text
494714Amended CodeCitation Text
494724Amended CodeCitation Text
9527New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2010&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2010%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2010
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2010%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2010
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2010%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2010
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2010%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2010
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00051.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00055.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0424.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00654.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00655.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0543.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback