WV HB2129 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2129
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to state the legal right and authority of state or local law enforcement to enter public areas on or adjacent to any private club, or take other appropriate police action to enforce the underage drinking laws of this state.
Title
Relating to the powers and authority of state and local law enforcement to enforce underage drinking laws at private clubs
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. John Overington [R] |
Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. Rodney Pyles [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 252) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 252) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 252) |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2129 (Carry Over) 2017-04-08 - Communicated to Senate
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 7 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |