WV HB2490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the secretary from proposing or enforcing any rules which prevent recreational water facilities from making necessary upgrades, renovations, or repairs.
Title
Preventing proposing or enforcing rules that prevent recreational water facilities from making necessary upgrades
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 513) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 85) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 85) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 513) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 85) |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |