WV HB2621 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - House Message received
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - House Message received
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establishing the offense of unlawful use of a wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle on a street or highway. It provides exceptions and conditions for certain lawful uses and definitions. It makes a violation a misdemeanor criminal offense with fine; and provides a limitation of enforcement.
Title
Prohibiting the use of cell phone and text-messaging devices while operating a motor vehicle except when using a hands-free device or in the case of an emergency
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Dale Martin [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] |
Del. Alex Shook [D] | Del. Carrie Webster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | House Message received | |
2009-04-11 | To conference | |
2009-04-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-11 | House appointed conferees: Brown, Miley, Lane | |
2009-04-11 | House agreed to conference | |
2009-04-11 | House received Senate message | |
2009-04-11 | Communicated to House | |
2009-04-11 | Senate appoints conference committee: Browning, Stollings, Barnes | |
2009-04-11 | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-11 | House Message received | |
2009-04-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-10 | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) | |
2009-04-10 | House received Senate message | |
2009-04-09 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2009-04-09 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 32) | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 31) | |
2009-04-09 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-04-09 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment not germane | |
2009-04-09 | Point of Order | |
2009-04-09 | Committee amendment as amended | |
2009-04-09 | Amendments to committee amendment reported | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-04-08 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-08 | On 1st reading | |
2009-04-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-04-08 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2009-03-30 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-30 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-30 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-27 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-03-27 | Passed House (Roll No. 132) | |
2009-03-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-27 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-26 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-25 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-25 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-03-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2009-02-26 | To House Judiciary | |
2009-02-26 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced in House | |
2009-02-18 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB637 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - On second reading to Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2621&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |