WV HB2861 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 57, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 57, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove a deterrent to public schools to seeking and assisting the enrollment of a student, who is at-risk and is becoming a discouraged and defeated learner, in an alternative program designed to prepare them for a successful transition back into the public schools. The bill sets forth characteristics of a discouraged and defeated learner, and al1ows the county superintendent to approve the continued enrollment of these students 1n the public schools while they are enrolled in the alternative program. The alternative program must meet certain conditions outlined in the bil1.
Title
Relating to continued enrollment of at-risk student in public school
Sponsors
Del. Amanda Pasdon [R] | Del. Mary Poling [D] | Del. Anthony Barill [D] | Del. Charlene Marshall [D] |
Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 443) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 442) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 45) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 39) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 38) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 442) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 45) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 39) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 38) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 57, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 443) |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 442) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 45) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 45) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-03-20 | Senate | To Education |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 39) |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 38) |
2013-03-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-15 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-14 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2013-03-14 | House | Do pass |
2013-03-07 | House | To House Education |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-07 | House | To Education then Finance |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |