WV HB2964 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 136, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 136, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the mayor to appoint chiefs of police and deputy chiefs of police
Title
Authorizing the mayor to appoint chiefs of police and deputy chiefs of police
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Lawrence [D] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Phillip Diserio [D] |
Del. Stephen Skinner [D] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 470) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 50) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 50) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 136, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 470) |
2013-04-13 | House | House reconsidered concurrence in Senate amendment |
2013-04-13 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 50) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 4/9/13 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 183) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-19 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 10 | 1b | New Code | See Bill Text |