WV HB3021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add two new members to the Comprehensive Behavioral Health Commission. The bill provides that if two specific members designate another person to serve in his or her place, those designees are nonvoting members. The bill requires a chairperson be selected by the commission members and that person may serve no more than two consecutive years. The bill also adds another member to the advisory board to the commission. The bill permits members who are on the board on July 1, 2011 to continue to serve. Further, the bill requires yearly reports to the Governor and Legislature and extends the life of the commission by another four years to 2015.
Title
Adding two new members to the Comprehensive Behavioral Health Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Passage (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Passage (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 76, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 418) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-11 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-11 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 28) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-11 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 27) | |
2011-03-11 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2011-03-10 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/4/11 | |
2011-03-04 | On 2nd reading to Government Organization | |
2011-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-04 | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2011-02-17 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2011-02-17 | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-17 | House Message received | |
2011-02-16 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Passed House (Roll No. 93) | |
2011-02-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-16 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-15 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-14 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-02-11 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-07 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-07 | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 42 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 42 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 42 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |