WV HB3275 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the date through which governmental entities are required to purchase workers' compensation through West Virginia Mutual Insurance Company.
Title
Changing the date through which governmental entities are required to purchase workers' compensation
Sponsors
Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. Thomas Campbell [D] | Del. Kevin Craig [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Del. Carrie Webster [D] | Del. Harry White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee | |
2009-04-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Laid over on 2nd reading 4/3/09 | |
2009-04-03 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-04-03 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-04-02 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-02 | On 1st reading | |
2009-04-02 | Committee reference dispensed | |
2009-04-02 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 213) | |
2009-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | Placed at foot of bills on third reading | |
2009-04-01 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-03-27 | By substitute, do pass | |
2009-03-25 | To House Finance | |
2009-03-25 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2009-03-23 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-23 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2009-03-23 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 2C | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3275&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |