WV HB4006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 72, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 72, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to elevator workers' licensure exemptions
Title
Relating to elevator workers' licensure exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 380) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 379) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 151) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 379) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 151) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 72, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/3/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-03 | Approved by Governor 4/3/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/3/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/23/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/23/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 380) | |
2012-03-10 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 379) | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-09 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-09 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) | |
2012-03-09 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 17) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-07 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-07 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-07 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-03-01 | To Government Organization | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-29 | Passed House (Roll No. 151) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-01-20 | Recommitted to Government Organization on 2nd reading | |
2012-01-20 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-19 | Read 1st time | |
2012-01-19 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-18 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-12 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-12 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 3C | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 3C | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 3C | 10b | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 3C | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |