WV HB4017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 314, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 314, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing country roads accountability and transparency
Title
Establishing country roads accountability and transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 702) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 523) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 522) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 523) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 522) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 314, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 702) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 523) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 522) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 17) |
2020-01-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-09 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-09 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |