WV HB4017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make general modifications to early voting procedures; registration by mail; voter registration services; unlawful registration or rejection of voter; alteration or destruction of records; early in person voting; and criminal penalties.
Title
To modify certain election laws, early voting laws, and absentee voting laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 61) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 60) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 60) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 61) |
2024-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 60) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 2 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 2 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 2 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |