WV HB4025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 477) (Y: 11 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 476) (Y: 21 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) (Y: 18 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 474) (Y: 20 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 473) (Y: 15 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 476) (Y: 21 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) (Y: 18 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 474) (Y: 20 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 473) (Y: 15 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 477) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 476) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 474) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 473) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |