WV HB4063 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require that commissioners have not been convicted of a felony or a misdemeanor involving moral turpitude and that they not be related to a county commissioner from which the appointment is made or to the president or chairman of a similarly situated association or of the county bar association from which the appointment is made. This bill has been completely rewritten; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Relating to civil service commissions in political subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 321) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 320) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 28) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 320) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 28) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void | |
2012-04-10 | Chapter 28, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 321) | |
2012-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 320) | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 4) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-07 | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-07 | Committee Amendment Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-03-01 | To Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-07 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-07 | House Message received | |
2012-02-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-06 | Passed House (Roll No. 28) | |
2012-02-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-06 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-02-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-03 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-02 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2012-02-01 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-19 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-01-13 | To House Political Subdivisions | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-13 | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary | |
2012-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 14 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 14 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |