WV HB4219 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the preparation and submission of geological reports incidental to oil and gas drilling and to require that logs and other valuable geological information obtained by operators in the normal course of business be delivered to the state Geological and Economic Survey.
Title
Reporting of certain geologic information obtained incidental to oil and gas drilling
Sponsors
Del. Larry Barker [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Del. Mike Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | Do pass | |
2010-02-11 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | To House Natural Resources | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House | |
2010-01-28 | To Natural Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB193 (Similar To) 2010-01-13 - To Energy, Industry and Mining
SB382 (Same As) 2010-06-06 - Effective Date
SB382 (Same As) 2010-06-06 - Effective Date
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 6 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4219&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |