WV HB4291 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide the option of eliminating duplicitous criminal background investigations with both the West Virginia State Police and the Federal Bureau of Investigation.
Title
Eliminating duplicitous criminal background investigations with both the West Virginia State Police and the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 15, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor 3/16/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor 3/16/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/16/10 | |
2010-03-13 | To Governor 3/13/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-13 | To Governor 3/13/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | To Governor 3/13/10 | |
2010-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-09 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) | |
2010-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-09 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-08 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-05 | Reported do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-03 | Passed House (Roll No. 162) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-11 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | To House Banking and Insurance | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-02 | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB377 (Same As) 2010-01-28 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4291&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |