WV HB4370 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying that the Statewide Interoperability Executive Committee is responsible to develop, update, and implement policies regarding the Statewide Interoperable Radio Network
Title
Clarifying that the Statewide Interoperability Executive Committee is responsible to develop, update, and implement policies regarding the Statewide Interoperable Radio Network
Sponsors
Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Charlie Reynolds [R] | Del. Doug Smith [R] |
Del. Johnnie Wamsley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-03 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-25 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Similar To) 2022-04-20 - Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 14 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 14 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |