WV HB4521 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 24, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 24, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the restructuring of child support payments of an inmate who is released under certain circumstances
Title
Permitting the restructuring of child support payments of an inmate who is released under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 441) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 180) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 180) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 24, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/27/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-27 | To Governor 3/27/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/27/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 441) | |
2012-03-10 | House concurred in Senate title amendment | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-09 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-09 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-07 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-07 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-07 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2012-03-01 | To Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Passed House (Roll No. 180) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-14 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB580 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - To Judiciary