WV HB4786 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 168, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 168, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Delivery Network Company Insurance Act. The bill provides for definitions. The bill defines interaction with other laws. The bill provides for insurance requirements. The bill provides for disclosures to Delivery Network Drivers. The bill provides for exclusions in motor vehicle liability insurance policies. Finally, the bill creates an effective date.
Title
Delivery Network Company (DNC) Insurance Model Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 500) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 709) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 436) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 147) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 709) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 436) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 147) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 168, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 500) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 709) |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 436) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Judiciary committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Banking and Insurance comm. amend. withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 147) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/9/2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-16 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 63 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 63 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 63 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 63 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 63 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 63 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |