WV HB4883 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to raise the salaries of certain state employees: West Virginia State Police and certain personnel; public school teachers; and school service personnel.
Title
Relating to increasing annual salaries of certain employees of the state
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. William Nestor [R] |
Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. Adam Vance [R] | Del. Kayla Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 748) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 514) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 514) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 358) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 341) (Y: 32 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 514) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 514) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 358) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 341) (Y: 32 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 748) |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 514) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 514) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/8/2024 with right to amend |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2024-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 358) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 341) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-17 | House | To House Finance |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-17 | House | To Finance |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB485 (Similar To) 2024-01-17 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |