WV HB5319 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the offense of exposing a law-enforcement officer, probation officer, parole officer, courthouse security officer, correctional officer, the State Fire Marshal, a deputy or assistant fire marshal, firefighter, or emergency medical service personnel to opioids.
Title
Creating the offense of exposing persons to fentanyl
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 207) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-16 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 207) |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |