WV HCR26 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Summary
The "Fort Pearsall Highway"
Title
The "Fort Pearsall Highway"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-12 | Adopted by Senate with amended title | |
2011-03-12 | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-12 | Reported be adopted, with amendments and title amendment | |
2011-02-25 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-02-25 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-25 | House Message received | |
2011-02-24 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-02-24 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | By substitute, be adopted | |
2011-01-27 | To House Rules | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-27 | To Rules | |
2011-01-27 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=26&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |